OCTOPUS FOR A PREEMIE UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to help and support premature babies through their first struggles. We provide crochet and knitted octopus calming aid for babies (the tentacles resemble the umbilical cord which comforts and soothes the baby therefore reducing the risk of them pulling or removing the tubes and leads). Help to support families and bring comfort to the parents in vulnerable and worrying time
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
350 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 December 2018: CIO registration
- OFAP UK (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH MARY PALMER | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NORMA BARKER | Trustee | 30 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Anne Saunders | Trustee | 07 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WELSH | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LAURA - JANE MEAD | Trustee | 04 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANNA MARIA CZECZENNIKOW | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £62.69k | £77.89k | £41.60k | £48.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.00k | £56.43k | £79.52k | £51.64k | £43.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 June 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 May 2022 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 09 September 2020 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 09 September 2020 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF PREMATURE AND SPECIAL NEED BABIES, ANGEL BABY FAMILIES AND DEMENTIA PATIENTS BY THE PROVISION OF A CALMING AID
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 College Gate
Bearsden
GLASGOW
East Dunbartonshire
G61 4GG
- Phone:
- 07598251598
- Email:
- octopusforapreemie@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window