ELLESMERE PORT AND DISTRICT U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We run several self help groups for semi and retired people such as bowls, history, book club, card games etc
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2018: Standard registration
- ELLESMERE PORT & DISTRICT U3A (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Wood | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Gillian Shimmin | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gordon Edmund Trigg | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Martin | Trustee | 07 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Shimmin | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne Dorethea Gill | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.63k | £1.66k | £5.34k | £9.20k | £4.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £1.03k | £2.80k | £10.28k | £3.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 May 2022 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUN 2011
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK BY ALL MEANS, INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDICIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Arran Avenue
ELLESMERE PORT
CH65 9JE
- Phone:
- 07775 630436
- Email:
- gordonetrigg@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window