WHITEWELL BOTTOM COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To benefit the residents of Whitewell Bottom, without distinction of sex, sexual orientation, race or of political, religious or other opinions by associating together the said residents with voluntary and other organisations in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time to improve life for residents
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £8,730 from 8 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Lancashire
Governance
- 07 June 2018: CIO registration
- 01 December 2019: Funds received from 1097925 WHITEWELL BOTTOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
- WHITEWELL BOTTOM COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tracy Cuthbertson | Chair | 30 May 2023 |
|
|||||||
David William Easton | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Klair Ward | Trustee | 30 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||
John Dawson | Trustee | 07 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Julie Dunstan Adshead | Trustee | 07 October 2019 |
|
|||||||
Christine Thomas | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
AMANDA ROBERTSON | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Carmen Carlton | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|||||||
JACQUELINE OAKES | Trustee | 11 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.52k | £28.67k | £36.18k | £43.96k | £41.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.54k | £29.65k | £43.12k | £39.49k | £47.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £770 | £12.00k | £4.50k | £5.59k | £8.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Jun 2018 as amended on 27 Jan 2020
Charitable objects
A) TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF WHITEWELL BOTTOM SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOODS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS; B) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL POWER TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE AND MANAGEMENT OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Whitewell Bottom Community Centre
Burnley Road East
ROSSENDALE
BB4 9LB
- Phone:
- 01706 218613
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window