ST MARGARET'S PREP SCHOOL PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising events such as School Fete, Summer Ball, Quiz night, Secondhand uniform sales
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 12 June 2018: Standard registration
- St. Margaret's PA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Lacey | Chair | 05 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL RYDER-BAYES | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Holly Emma Gregory | Trustee | 28 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paige Bowkett | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Amy Bacon | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ketley | Trustee | 25 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Bailey | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.39k | £10.16k | £16.36k | £34.13k | £9.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.62k | £19.87k | £9.23k | £32.26k | £10.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 July 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL. IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE ASSOCIATION MAY:- 1) DEVELOP MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL. 2)ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING. 3) PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED)
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. MARGARETS PREPARATORY SCHOOL
GOSFIELD HALL PARK
GOSFIELD
HALSTEAD
CO9 1SE
- Phone:
- 01787472134
- Email:
- stmagspa@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window