THE LLOYD'S FOOTBALL CLUB MATTHEW HARDING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lloyd's Football club charitable events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 August 2018: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM BELL | Chair | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY BROTHERS | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN TEBBUTT | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL OWEN | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.00k | £6.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £216 | £216 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 April 2025 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 April 2025 | 450 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 February 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO DESERVING CAUSES THAT ARE BROUGHT TO THE ATTENTION OF LLOYD'S FOOTBALL CLUB AND APPROVED AS SUCH BY THE LLOYD'S FOOTBALL CLUB MATTHEW HARDING TRUST AND IN SO DOING ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR ANY OTHER DISADVANTAGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 WATERFORD OAKS LANE
KEMAH
TEXAS
77565
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
- Phone:
- +18327684956
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window