Financial history AL JAMIATUL ISLAMIA DARUL QURAN TRUST

Charity number: 1180028
Charity reporting is up to date (29 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £23.68k £23.64k £17.98k £32.22k £33.81k
Total expenditure £19.64k £25.36k £30.58k £29.24k £33.69k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A