ENVIRONMENTAL INVESTIGATION AGENCY UK

Charity number: 1182208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We investigate and campaign against environmental crime and abuse. Our focus is the protection of climate, forests, ocean and wildlife. Our findings are used to campaign for improved governance and effective enforcement. Until 2019, EIA UK operated as not-for-profit company limited by guarantee no.07752350. For financial information and previous years' activities, visit Companies House.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England
  • Belgium
  • Burma
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • China
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Costa Rica
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Egypt
  • France
  • Gabon
  • Germany
  • Hong Kong
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Ireland
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Kenya
  • Laos
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Netherlands
  • Nigeria
  • Norway
  • Panama
  • Portugal
  • Romania
  • Rwanda
  • Senegal
  • Singapore
  • Slovenia
  • South Africa
  • South Korea
  • Spain
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Taiwan
  • Thailand
  • Uganda
  • United States
  • Uruguay
  • Vietnam
  • Zambia

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 2019: Standard registration
  • 21 December 2020: Funds received from 1145359 ENVIRONMENTAL INVESTIGATION AGENCY TRUST LTD
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • EIA UK (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
John Edmund Stephenson Chair 24 September 2020
None on record
Dr Amelia Kate Roberts Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Keith Anthony Roberts Trustee 28 March 2024
None on record
Mannat Mehr Kaur Malhi Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Alice Rose Railton Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Paul John Townley Trustee 14 May 2021
None on record
Pesh Framjee Trustee 14 May 2021
None on record
Katherine Stoner Trustee 07 May 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.72m £3.91m £4.16m £5.33m £5.96m
Total expenditure £3.06m £3.54m £3.73m £4.84m £5.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.02m £978.91k £658.74k £1.45m £536.18k
Income - Donations and legacies £501.89k £785.32k £863.49k £502.07k £1.44m
Income - Other trading activities £225 £1.75k £1.00k £0 £6.09k
Income - Charitable activities £3.09m £3.12m £3.26m £4.81m £4.50m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £5.35k £644 £178 £1.14k £13.03k
Income - Other £125.64k £0 £37.51k £9.85k £150
Income - Legacies £137.59k £266.17k £356.31k £69.55k £338.30k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.87m £3.33m £3.52m £4.63m £4.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £186.44k £208.00k £210.40k £209.59k £323.82k
Expenditure - Governance £47.66k £77.25k £33.70k £23.30k £20.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution £303.54k £422.93k £606.38k £1.16m £876.57k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £39.89k £38.85k £26.86k £28.59k £45.28k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £1.73m £2.00m £2.51m £3.15m £3.68m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £426.08k £325.90k £394.53k £557.25k £451.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 29 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
62 - 63 UPPER STREET
LONDON
N1 0NY
Phone:
02073547960