WASHINGTON ATHLETIC YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WASHINGTON ATHLETIC YOUTH FOOTBALL CLUB provides football coaching and training for children of primary school and secondary school age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sunderland
Governance
- 05 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TERRY RUTHERFORD | Chair | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN CORRIGAN | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY RUTHERFORD | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN RIDLEY DODD | Trustee | 27 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.11k | £77.22k | £68.81k | £119.24k | £217.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72.85k | £56.63k | £92.51k | £100.52k | £206.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £16.81k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 25 March 2025 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 14 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 20 March 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 01 April 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 July 2021 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 05 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SUNDERLAND AGED BETWEEN THREE AND SIXTEEN BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
105 BEDE CRESCENT
WASHINGTON
NE38 7HZ
- Phone:
- 07905653874
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window