SECOND CHANCE HEAD AND NECK CANCER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To preserve and protect good health of patients who have been disgnosed with Head and Neck Cancer and their relatives. To provide a wide range of practical, social and emotional support. Reduce the impact of isolation by organising social events. Assist people to understand and adapt to changes in lifestyle. Provide mentoring and regular 'drop in' services. Use a variety of methods to fundraise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
- Hounslow
- Surrey
Governance
- 20 May 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LISA PITKIN | Chair | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATIE WOOD | Trustee | 15 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.17k | £1.80k | £2.26k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.20k | £212 | £958 | £3.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 20 May 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH FOR THE PUBLIC OF PATIENTS AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO HAVE BEEN DIAGNOSED WITH HEAD AND NECK CANCER LIVING IN SURREY, WEST SUSSEX, EAST HAMPSHIRE, SOUTH MIDDLESEX AND ARE UNDER THE CARE OF THE ROYAL SURREY COUNTY HOSPITAL HEAD AND NECK TUMOUR GROUP BY:- 1. PROVIDING A WIDE RANGE OF SUPPORT WHICH IS NOT PROVIDED BY THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE. THE CHARITY WILL WORK CLOSELY WITH THE HEALTH AND SOCIAL CARE PROFESSIONALS WORKING IN THIS FIELD. THE SERVICES THAT THE CHARITY DELIVERS AIM TO PROVIDE PEOPLE WITH BOTH PRACTICAL, SOCIAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT THAT WOULD ENABLE THEM TO MAXIMISE THEIR POTENTIAL AND MINIMISE THE IMPACT OF THIS TYPE OF CANCER ON THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE; 2. PROVIDING ACTUAL AND VIRTUAL FORUMS WHERE PEOPLE CAN LEARN FROM OTHER PEOPLE WHO HAVE UNDERGONE SIMILAR LIFE CHANGING EXPERIENCES; 3. REDUCING THE IMPACT OF ISOLATION BY ORGANISING SOCIAL EVENTS WHERE PEOPLE CAN SOCIALISE WITHOUT THE NEED TO EXPLAIN THEIR COMMUNICATION, EATING AND DRINKING DIFFICULTIES; 4. ASSISTING PEOPLE TO UNDERSTAND AND ADAPT TO CHANGES IN LIFESTYLE, CONFIDENCE AND LOW MOOD OFTEN ASSOCIATED WITH THE TREATMENT WORKING CLOSELY WITH ALL LOCAL AND NATIONAL STATUTORY AND NON-STATUTORY AGENCIES AND ORGANISATIONS IN ORDER TO HELP PEOPLE ADJUST AND LEAD FULFILLING LIVES; 5. PROMOTING AND INCREASING KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE IMPACT THAT THE DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT FOR HEAD AND NECK CANCER HAS ON INDIVIDUALS, FAMILIES AND CARERS; 6. PROVIDING MENTORING AND REGULAR DROP IN SERVICES AT A VARIETY OF SETTINGS AND LOCATIONS FOR PATIENTS AND FAMILIES AND THOSE WHO HAVE FINISHED MEDICAL TREATMENT; 7. PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR PARTNERS, CAREGIVERS AND FAMILIES; 8. USING A VARIETY OF METHODS TO FUNDRAISE TO SUPPORT BOTH ITS WORK AND TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT THAT WOULD NOT BE ROUTINELY PURCHASED BY THE NHS BY A RANGE OF METHODS INCLUDING VOLUNTARY DONATIONS, SPECIFIC INITIATIVES AND SPONSORSHIP; 9. CONTINUALLY ADAPTING TO THE NEEDS OF THE TARGET GROUP BY ENSURING THAT IT IS PROVIDING APPROPRIATE AND ACCESSIBLE SERVICES AND WILL REVIEW ITS WORK ON A REGULAR BASIS BY USING A VARIETY OF METHODS INCLUDING QUESTIONNAIRES AND FOCUS GROUPS; 10. USING A RANGE OF METHODS TO COMMUNICATE WITH ITS MEMBERS AND WIDER PUBLIC; 11. PROMOTE THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP BY OFFERING VOLUNTEERING OPPORTUNITIES WHERE APPROPRIATE; 12. PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY WITHIN THE CHARITY. TO ACT AS ADVOCATES WORKING TO REDUCE POTENTIAL DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF MEDICAL AND SURGICAL TREATMENTS, RACE, RELIGION, ETHNICITY, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, POLITICAL VIEWS OR FINANCIAL STATUS; 13. SUPPORTING RESEARCH INTO THE PREVENTION, TREATMENT, CURE AND REHABILITATION OF THOSE REQUIRING TREATMENT FOR HEAD AND NECK CANCER WHERE IT IS SHOWN TO BE IN THE PUBLIC INTEREST AND TO PUBLISH ALL OF THE USEFUL RESULTS INTO THE PUBLIC DOMAIN; 14. LIAISING WITH SIMILAR GROUPS NATIONALLY AND INTERNATIONALLY TO FURTHER THE AIMS LISTED ABOVE; AND 15. SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008].
Area of benefit
IN SURREY, WEST SUSSEX, EAST HAMPSHIRE, SOUTH MIDDLESEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lee Farm
New Lane
Sutton Green
Guildford
GU4 7QF
- Phone:
- 07788858234
- Email:
- info@headandneckcancer.life
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window