Accounts and annual returns RUSSIAN COMMUNITY GROUP

Charity Number: 1183594
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 11 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 11 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 18 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 29 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 16 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window