WEY KAYAK CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for the sport of canoeing and kayaking
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Total income includes £12,128 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 December 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Rossiter | Chair | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Clifford | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Donal McCarthy Macintyre Mr | Trustee | 11 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fay Lamph | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Roeser | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PETER GORMAN | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID KITCHING | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Halliwell | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|||||
ADRIAN PAUL HENSON | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL LUCK | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £118.37k | £94.97k | £108.85k | £119.49k | £130.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.37k | £112.37k | £86.61k | £130.75k | £122.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £12.13k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 16 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 30 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 11 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 20 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 10 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE SPORT OF CANOEING AND KAYAKING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Waterside Centre
Riverside
GUILDFORD
GU1 1LW
- Phone:
- 07817327245
- Email:
- treasurer@weykayak.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window