Financial history DEG TEG FATEH

Charity number: 1184054
Charity reporting is up to date (18 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £3.60k £25.00k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £3.55k £24.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A