Financial history SEVA STREET

Charity number: 1180811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/03/2020 01/03/2021 01/03/2022 01/03/2023 01/03/2024
Total gross income £13.68k £65.43k £40.64k £28.66k £35.45k
Total expenditure £8.98k £39.14k £42.93k £21.23k £27.48k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A