SEVA STREET

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We strive to raise awareness of Rough Sleepers, we provide hot nutritious vegetarian food on a Wednesday at Stratford and Ilford. We also provide snacks, hot and cold drinks, clothes and hair and facial beard trimming.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 23 November 2018: CIO registration
- SEVA - SERVING WITH LOVE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUKHJIT SINGH AHLUWALIA | Chair | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Saiesha Ahluwalia | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roomy Kharpal | Trustee | 14 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2020 | 01/03/2021 | 01/03/2022 | 01/03/2023 | 01/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.68k | £65.43k | £40.64k | £28.66k | £35.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.98k | £39.14k | £42.93k | £21.23k | £27.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 201 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | 21 July 2023 | 201 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE IN SUCH PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING FREE FOOD AND DRINK, SHELTER, WARMTH, COMPANIONSHIP AND SIGNPOSTING TO OTHER SUPPORT SERVICES FOR PEOPLE WHO LIVE ON THE STREETS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Avery Emerson Solicitors
335 Green Lane
ILFORD
IG3 9TH
- Phone:
- 02082150884
- Email:
- sa@ae-law.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window