Financial history SOLIHULL COMMUNITY BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1178732
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.00k £528 £3.94k £13.29k £12.21k
Total expenditure £7.92k £2.72k £15.04k £14.73k £13.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A