Financial history MUSLIM ASSOCIATION OF NIGERIA UK

Charity Number: 1179477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £521.68k £521.68k £716.87k £594.67k
Total expenditure £0 £482.18k £482.18k £420.19k £311.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.73k £9.74k £25.95k £15.00k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £397.45k £397.45k £593.57k £472.66k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £35.16k £35.16k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A £12.88k £12.88k £9.83k £64.64k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £10.68k £10.68k £6.81k £23
Income - Other N/A £65.51k £65.51k £106.65k £57.35k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £276.46k £276.46k £217.30k £211.97k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £205.72k £205.72k £49.90k £54.72k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £244.72k £0 £101.71k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £244.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £152.98k £45.05k