NATIONAL CIVILIAN WW2 MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise funds and carry out activities to educate people in the experience of civilians during World War 2 . Also to preserve and maintain the remains of the National Picture Theatre on Beverley Road Hull which is a ruined cinema damaged during the blitz of World War 2, and is listed Grade 2 for its historic interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kingston Upon Hull City
Governance
- 06 July 2018: CIO registration
- 12 February 2021: Funds received from 1149217 NATIONAL CIVILIAN WW2 MEMORIAL TRUST
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TOM ROBINSON | Chair | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Best | Trustee | 28 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ALEXANDER | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
ALAN CANVESS | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY BYERS | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|||||
ANDREW HAMPEL | Trustee | 21 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09k | £276 | £2.68k | £2.23k | £2.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.55k | £5.00k | £1.18k | £1.03k | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 May 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jul 2018
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF WW2, ESPECIALLY THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE PEOPLE THAT SERVED ON THE HOME FRONT, AND THOSE THAT LIVED THROUGH THE WAR. 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE REMAINS OF THE GRADE II LISTED NATIONAL PICTURE THEATRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Kirkham Drive
Hull
HU5 2BT
- Phone:
- 01482446320
- Email:
- ncww2mt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
ncww2mt.freewebspace.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window