JORDAN HEALING CHURCH INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bible Study Workshops & Online Courses for ministers, disciples and leaders. Family and Marriage Programs. Support, Personal & Professional Development of Ex-Offenders who are NEET. Open Space and Hiring Facilities for the public. Biblical Teaching and Preaching Materials for the church and the public to access. Music, Arts & Craft community activities. Childcare Support & Facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Jamaica
- Kenya
- Zambia
Governance
- 09 August 2018: Standard registration
- JORDAN HEALING CHURCH (Working name)
- Unique Venue Hire (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SWASSWALA KAYUMBA | Chair | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Coletane Lopez | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Valsi Gordon | Trustee | 19 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE NAKITA KAYUMBA | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.73k | £71.25k | £62.92k | £53.87k | £52.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.67k | £71.10k | £62.29k | £52.63k | £50.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 99 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 February 2022 | 99 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 February 2022 | 464 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 07 February 2022 | 464 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
1. TO SERVE GOD AND TO FULFIL THE GREAT COMMISSION OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST AS SET FORTH IN MATTHEW 28:19-20, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND INFORMATION THROUGH TRAININGS AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES FOR THE BENEFIT OF BELIEVERS AND PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY OF ALL AGES. 2. TO MINISTER TO THE NEEDS OF THE BELIEVERS AND COMMUNITY AS THE CHURCH IS ABLE TO DO SO, BY PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT SPIRITUAL, MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING. 3. TO WORK TOWARD ADVANCING THE KINGDOM OF GOD, DISCOVERING INDIVIDUAL GIFTS AND EXPANDING THEM, BY FOCUSING ON BUILDING AND EMPOWERING CITIZENS OF THE KINGDOM OF GOD AND THE COMMUNITY TO REACH THEIR FULL POTENTIAL BY REALISING WHAT THEIR PURPOSE IS AND ACCOMPLISH IT. 4. TO WORK TOWARDS THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION ACCORDING TO BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES, BY PROVIDING BIBLE STUDY CLASSES, SEMINARS AND CONFERENCES. 5. TO WORK TOWARDS MEETING THE NEED OF PEOPLE IN THE COMMUNITY, BY PROVIDING HELP AND SUPPORT FOR THE RELIEF OF SPIRITUAL AND PHYSICAL POVERTY. 6. TO DO ANY AND ALL THINGS RELATED TO AND IN CONNECTION WITH THE CARRYING OUT OF THE OBJECT AND PURPOSE HEREIN ABOVE SET FORTH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NOWELL APPROACH
LEEDS
LS9 6HH
- Phone:
- 01134401287
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window