REFUGEE AID FROM TAUNTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We carry out our objects by receiving donations from members of the public and distributing these to refugees, both in the local community and across the world. Any items unsuitable for distribution are sold at a reduced rate to the local community. We aim to be zero waste wherever possible, using all donated items in some form, donating to other charities where no other options are available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Burma
- Cameroon
- France
- Ghana
- Greece
- India
- Lebanon
- Macedonia
- Malawi
- Romania
- Serbia
- Syria
- Uganda
- Ukraine
Governance
- 18 October 2018: CIO registration
- RAFT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
FEDERICA SMITH-ROBERTS | Chair | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ROYLANCE | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA WINTRIP | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
KEITH DEW | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
LYNETTE CLARK | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
FAREDA FAKHRAI | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Clare Ferris | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|||||
MARK CURTIS | Trustee | 18 October 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.65k | £17.83k | £35.09k | £50.44k | £46.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.27k | £10.63k | £10.75k | £39.23k | £59.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: 1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO RELIEVE AND ASSIST THE VICTIMS OF WAR, CONFLICT OR NATURAL DISASTER THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION OF CLOTHING, SANITARY WEAR, VOLUNTEERS, FUNDS, FOOD, MEDICAL AID, ACCOMMODATION, ACCESS TO WATER AND SANITATION AND OTHER HUMANITARIAN ASSISTANCE. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING PERSONS IN NEED WITH GRANTS OR MONEY OR BY PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR SERVICES, ITEMS OR FACILITIES. 3) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROMOTION OF RECYCLING AND SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT; 4) TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 4
Enterprise Park
Priorswood Road
Taunton
Somerset
TA2 8DU
- Phone:
- 07545895768
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window