FRIENDS OF MARGAM PARK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Margam Park objectives are to conserve and enhance Margam Country Park, protect its natural beauty, raise the parks profile, increase public awareness and work with the Local Authority as well as other appropriate organisations. The Friends provide walks and tours with an historical interest, in the summer months together with other activities on a voluntary basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income includes £17,013 from 4 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
145 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 01 August 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jemma Louise Davies | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theresa Davies | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Robbins | Trustee | 21 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Alfred Lindsay | Trustee | 28 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.12k | £27.64k | £2.84k | £35.04k | £30.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.78k | £8.20k | £23.18k | £35.96k | £27.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.36k | N/A | N/A | £17.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 02 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 August 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 21 August 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2021 | 330 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 26 April 2021 | 330 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC IN NEATH PORT TALBOT AND ARE THE SURROUNDING AREA BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF MARGAM COUNTRY PARK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends of Margam Park
Park Office
Margam Country Park
Margam
PORT TALBOT
West Gla
- Phone:
- 01639898565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window