Financial history POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK GRAYS CHURCH

Charity number: 1181423
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £28.49k £24.79k £28.29k £26.18k £27.49k
Total expenditure £27.42k £22.47k £29.21k £27.32k £27.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A