POTTERS HOUSE CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP UK GRAYS CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Church arranges or participates in a number of activities to this end, namely Bible Conferences, Marriage Seminars, Mens Discipleships, Revival Meetings with visiting preachers and Tent Crusades (home and abroad). The relief of poverty and sickness regardless of nationality, religious, political and other opinion in said county and discretion of church council elsewhere in the UK or world.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
Governance
- 04 January 2019: CIO registration
- POTTERS HOUSE GRAYS CHURCH (Working name)
- THE POTTER'S HOUSE GRAYS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
VICTOR OSITA OKONKWO | Chair | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julius Igaba | Trustee | 17 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
KINGSLEY CHINEDU ANABA | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
COURTNEY WESLEY STEWART | Trustee | 04 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.49k | £24.79k | £28.29k | £26.18k | £27.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.42k | £22.47k | £29.21k | £27.32k | £27.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 15 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH IN THE ATTACHED SCHEDULE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; 4.2 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY REGARDLESS OF NATIONALITY, RELIGIOUS POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; AND 4.3 SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Culverin Avenue
GRAYS
Essex
RM16 2BF
- Phone:
- 07903349001
- Email:
- info@phgrays.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window