THE WAKEFIELD ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO provides almshouses to people who are in need or experiencing poverty or infirmity. All the almshouses are in central Totnes, Devon
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 28 August 2018: CIO registration
- 07 February 2023: Funds received from 1041964 THE WAKEFIELD ALMSHOUSES CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JUSTINE ANNE HOLMES | Chair | 23 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
JANET MITCHELL | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
MARK CHRISTOPHER MITCHELL | Trustee | 23 July 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.76k | £66.56k | £63.21k | £64.13k | £67.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.79k | £22.18k | £22.13k | £43.93k | £41.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Aug 2018
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN ENGLAND WHO ARE IN NEED OR EXPERIENCING POVERTY OR INFIRMITY. (2) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS IN THE ALMSHOUSES OF THE CIO IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE COACH HOUSE
STATION ROAD
SOUTH BRENT
TQ10 9BB
- Phone:
- 01392581580
- Email:
- contact1@john7.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window