Governing document RHSC SAILABILITY
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 31 AUG 2018 as amended on 29 Nov 2018 as amended on 08 Nov 2018 as amended on 16 May 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR DISABILITIES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE, IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING RECREATIONAL AND COMPETITIVE SAILING, IN THE COUNTY OF EAST SUSSEX AND KENT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.