FRIENDS OF ISLAND HISTORY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recording and sharing the history of the isle of Dogs.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 06 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Edward John Ward | Chair | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Anne Mary Levett | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Angela Bohan | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Glenis Caryn Franklin | Trustee | 09 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marion Heselden | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.35k | £6.92k | £11.17k | £11.76k | £8.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.12k | £8.49k | £11.43k | £10.29k | £9.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 06 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE SOCIAL INDUSTRIAL & POLITICAL HISTORY OF THE ISLE OF DOGS THROUGH RESEARCH, COMPILING OF RECORDS AND LEAFLETS & OTHER PUBLICATIONS; ARRANGING LECTURES, MEETINGS, EVENTS, EXHIBITIONS & OTHER EVENTS, AND BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF AN ARCHIVE CONTAINING INFORMATION, IMAGES ARTEFACTS AND PHOTOGRAPHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Friends Of Island History Trust
St John's Community Centre
The History Room
37-43 Glengall Grove
London
E14 3NE
- Phone:
- 07926571520
- Email:
- foiht2014@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window