BETHESDA EVANGELICAL CHURCH, HAY ON WYE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Each Sunday both our morning and evening services are open to the public for Christian worship. We also hold midweek meetings for Bible study and prayer, a childrens club, and a mums and tots group. We take a monthly service at the local care home, and our pastor takes school assemblies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Gordon James Bingham | Chair | 15 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jane Dodds | Trustee | 09 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peter Lewis | Trustee | 24 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.56k | £26.37k | £27.30k | £32.82k | £62.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.91k | £28.65k | £33.44k | £39.57k | £41.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 17 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 13 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 19 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE: THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WITHIN HAY ON WYE AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD; AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION; AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CHURCH FROM TIME TO TIME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE CHURCH HANDBOOK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bethesda Evangelical Church
Oxford Road
Hay-on-Wye
HEREFORD
HR3 5AJ
- Phone:
- 01497820685
- Email:
- gjbingham@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window