COMPTON CARE GROUP LIMITED

Charity number: 512387
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve and provide palliative care to persons principally resident in Wolverhampton, Dudley, Sandwell and Walsall and the counties of Staffordshire and Shropshire who are suffering from cancer, lymphoedema or terminal illness. To provide education and training for healthcare professionals and others, including volunteers, who are involved in providing palliative care.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Dudley
  • Sandwell
  • Shropshire
  • Staffordshire
  • Walsall
  • Wolverhampton

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 March 1982: Standard registration
  • 17 April 2019: Funds received from 1068293 THE NOVA CHARITABLE TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • COMPTON HOSPICE (Working name)
  • COMPTON HALL LIMITED (Previous name)
  • COMPTON HOSPICE LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mrs Rosemary Eileen Keeton Chair 27 July 2016
None on record
Carl Roy Peddie Trustee 14 August 2024
None on record
Denise Mary Burkett-Stus Trustee 27 March 2023
None on record
Dr Davinder Bagary Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Adam Guy Frankling Trustee 16 November 2022
None on record
Helen Macpherson Hibbs Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Anne Elizabeth Brookes Trustee 10 November 2021
None on record
Helen Julia Holden Trustee 17 February 2021
None on record
Linda Annette Pascall Trustee 03 April 2020
None on record
Mr Jim McKinnon Trustee 09 February 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.24m £12.10m £13.71m £12.13m £13.12m
Total expenditure £12.45m £11.85m £11.97m £13.77m £14.79m
Income from government contracts £2.86m N/A N/A £70.06k £3.69m
Income from government grants N/A £3.88m £4.82m £3.35m N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.59m £2.90m £4.29m £2.87m £3.58m
Income - Other trading activities £4.43m £1.59m £4.33m £5.31m £5.49m
Income - Charitable activities £2.91m £6.16m £4.82m £3.69m £3.74m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £314.47k £172.51k £154.82k £263.40k £307.15k
Income - Other £0 £1.27m £117.58k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £1.00m £1.80m £3.36m £1.96m £2.40m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.12m £7.89m £7.51m £8.78m £9.48m
Expenditure - Raising funds £4.32m £3.97m £4.47m £4.99m £5.30m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £16.49k £18.13k £19.40k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £19.14k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £42.04k £34.83k £35.66k £33.24k £34.76k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £8.05m £9.11m £7.60m £7.34m £7.14m
Long-term investments £6.65m £6.70m £6.77m £6.22m £7.19m
Other assets £4.73m £4.50m £8.60m £7.35m £5.38m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £1.49m £880.28k £1.18m £1.26m £1.27m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 19 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 19 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 21 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 15 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 07 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COMPTON CARE GROUP LTD
COMPTON HALL
4 COMPTON ROAD WEST
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV3 9DH
Phone:
03003230250