Trustees PRE-ECLAMPSIA AND OSTEO ARTHRITIS MEDICAL RELIEF FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1178700

Charity reporting is up to date (14 days late)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YASSIN SAGNIA JENG | Chair | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Wally Seck | Trustee | 10 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Modou lamin Puye | Trustee | 16 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lamin JK SANNEH | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
FATIMA JENG | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
KHADIJA CEESAY | Trustee | 30 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
YOUSSOU N'DOUR | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
AIDA COULIBALY N'DOUR | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
YANDEH JOBE | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
EBRIMA CEESAY | Trustee | 08 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.