Financial history MISSION EMPLOYABLE

Charity number: 1181597
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £143.26k £752.76k £614.19k £1.03m £702.30k
Total expenditure £24.58k £19.85k £76.53k £585.98k £731.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £56.00k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £748.87k £436.37k £541.89k £37.92k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £3.88k £118.74k £49.79k £17.51k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 £59.08k £438.88k £637.66k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £3.76k £9.18k
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £26
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £4.43k £43.16k £553.85k £719.99k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £15.42k £33.38k £32.14k £11.09k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £3.65k £4.06k £4.95k £4.42k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0