FROME WEAVERS SPINNERS AND DYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Learning techniques of weaving, spinning and dying in a dedicated facility. Sharing related knowledge through mentoring and discussion. Mounting exhibitions, sales and open events to serve the local area. Working cooperatively with other local organisations, including schools, to advance knowledge and understanding of these crafts and their place in local heritage.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Somerset
Governance
- 04 December 2018: CIO registration
- FROME TEXTILE WORKSHOP (Working name)
- FROME WSD (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Judith Loveridge | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Shona Penelope Ann Milford | Trustee | 03 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Lone Hattingh | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Gibson | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mary Boston | Trustee | 25 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.57k | £11.26k | £13.93k | £12.46k | £12.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.46k | £14.80k | £12.16k | £10.60k | £10.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: (A) TO FURTHER THE PRESERVATION, SKILL, EXCELLENCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF CRAFTSMANSHIP IN WEAVING, SPINNING AND DYEING FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN FROME, AND (B) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH CRAFTSMANSHIP.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Redwood Rare Breeds
Station Road
Wanstrow
SHEPTON MALLET
Somerset
BA4 4SZ
- Phone:
- 07500595630
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window