SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide treatment and care for people diagnosed with terminal illness in Shropshire, Telford & Wrekin, Powys and Ceredigion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£14,712,000
Donations and legacies | £3.90m | |
Charitable activities | £4.04m | |
Other trading activities | £6.24m | |
Investments | £450.00k | |
Other | £78.00k |
Total expenditure:
£14,712,000
Raising funds | £4.70m | |
Charitable activities | £10.01m | |
Other | £0 |
£471,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,040,000 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.70m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.01m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £4.70m | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.01m | |
Retained for future use | £471.00k |
People

468 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1094 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£120k to £130k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Ceredigion
- Powys
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 11 March 1982: Standard registration
- 06 June 2023: Funds received from 1110068 THE HORSEHAY & DISTRICT TOWNSWOMEN'S GUILD
- 23 August 2023: Funds received from 1019200 WELLINGTON COTTAGE CARE TRUST
- 13 February 2024: Funds received from 1098512 THE SHREWSBURY AND DISTRICT BREATHING CLUB
- 07 May 2024: Funds received from 700911 THE NIGHTINGALE NURSING FUND
- SEVERN HOSPICE (Working name)
- THE SEVERN HOSPICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- THE SHROPSHIRE HOSPICE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Stephen Robinson | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Casey | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Fay Crosby | Trustee | 28 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathryn Joan Downton | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Bathurst | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Graham Frank Northern | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Clarkson | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Allan Gold | Trustee | 29 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Stephen Andrew Bleakley | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Debra Towse | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Ashley Fraser | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeanette Therese Whitford | Trustee | 12 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MARCUS WARDLE | Trustee | 10 August 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.91m | £13.22m | £13.61m | £14.10m | £14.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.33m | £11.82m | £12.85m | £13.81m | £14.71m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.71m | £7.81m | £3.95m | £3.89m | £4.04m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £4.01m | £2.76m | £4.08m | £3.79m | £3.90m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £4.86m | £2.42m | £5.26m | £6.02m | £6.24m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.71m | £3.95m | £4.00m | £3.89m | £4.04m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £245.84k | £166.04k | £188.95k | £305.00k | £450.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £75.46k | £3.93m | £86.69k | £95.00k | £78.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.82m | £1.04m | £2.39m | £2.17m | £2.28m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £8.80m | £8.61m | £8.94m | £9.57m | £10.01m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.53m | £3.21m | £3.91m | £4.25m | £4.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £82.16k | £107.74k | £109.57k | £97.00k | £95.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £41.91k | £42.97k | £51.92k | £47.00k | £59.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.22m | £12.40m | £12.15m | £12.20m | £12.55m | |
|
Long-term investments | £6.03m | £8.17m | £8.50m | £7.98m | £8.38m | |
|
Other assets | £8.16m | £7.37m | £7.99m | £8.14m | £7.88m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.20m | £1.30m | £1.05m | £1.13m | £1.15m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 04 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/01/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/01/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/09/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/09/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/05/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/07/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2016 AS AMENDED ON 10 DEC 2020 AS AMENDED ON 30 SEP 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 SEP 2022
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, THE WELL-BEING OF PATIENTS AND ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY SUCH CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE ASSOCIATION SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT, IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE COUNTIES OF SHROPSHIRE AND THE FORMER MONTGOMERYSHIRE AREA OF POWYS. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 4 OF ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION).
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF SHROPSHIRE AND MID WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
SEVERN HOSPICE LTD
BICTON HEATH
SHREWSBURY
SY3 8HS
- Phone:
- 01743236565
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window