KINGS HEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE SEEK TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH WORSHIP, PRAISE, PRAYER, DISCUSSION, PASTORAL CARE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND CHARITABLE WORKS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 19 July 2018: CIO registration
- 13 December 2023: Funds received from 1177040 KINGS HEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH
- KINGS HEATH CHRISTADELPHIAN ECCLESIA (Working name)
- KINGS HEATH CHRISTADELPHIANS (Working name)
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Paul Mee | Trustee | 10 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Purkis | Trustee | 13 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joshua Mark Pearson | Trustee | 09 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mary Elizabeth Ryder | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suzette Anne Thompson | Trustee | 18 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Jane Brown | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £229.95k | £82.26k | £46.31k | £27.64k | £26.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £161.03k | £129.44k | £40.18k | £25.62k | £35.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED ON AMENDED ON 07 FEB 2023 as amended on 15 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES THROUGH WORSHIP, PRAISE, PRAYER, DISCUSSION, PASTORAL CARE AND OTHER ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE SPIRITUAL GROWTH AND CHARITABLE WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHRISTADELPHIAN CHURCH
23 INSTITUTE ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B14 7EG
- Phone:
- 07713 686972
- Email:
- hello@kingsheathchurch.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window