ST JOHN FISHER SCHOOL GOVERNORS' FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the children of St John Fisher RC Primary School in Merton for the public benefit by providing and assisting in the provision of facilities and resources, determined at the sole discretion of the trustees, for education at the school and not required to be provided by the local education authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Merton
Governance
- 08 June 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Blom | Chair | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Jane Asgill | Trustee | 09 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alain Emile Albert van West | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
FRANCIS JAVIER ENRIQUE HUIDOBRO | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.45k | £15.07k | £17.66k | £17.29k | £17.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.09k | £11.67k | £6.17k | £25.91k | £17.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 22 MAY 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CHILDREN OF ST JOHN FISHER RC PRIMARY SCHOOL IN MERTON FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND RESOURCES, DETERMINED AT THE SOLE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES, FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. JOHN FISHER RC PRIMARY SCHOOL
GRAND DRIVE
LONDON
SW20 9NA
- Phone:
- 02085402637
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window