Accounts and annual returns SURF LIFE SAVING DEVON

Charity number: 1179504
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 31 January 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 31 January 2025 33 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 27 April 2024 121 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 27 April 2024 121 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 28 November 2022 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2021 21 March 2022 83 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 21 March 2022 83 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 29 February 2020 31 January 2021 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 31 January 2021 33 days late Download Open in new window