LOSTWITHIEL AREA U3A

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a self-help organisation for people who are retired, semi-retired or no longer in full time employment providing educational, creative and leisure opportunities in a friendly environment. We offer members from Lostwithiel and surrounding areas interest groups and general meetings where a guest speaker is arranged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 25 July 2018: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lalita Madhvani | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Richard Hemsley | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Carolyn Hemsley | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Monica Dickin | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Geoffrey Platt | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Mary Thomas | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Marten | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anne-Marie Jocelyne Leone Singer | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Margaret McKinder | Trustee | 19 July 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.01k | £773 | £10.68k | £10.79k | £10.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.32k | £2.63k | £9.05k | £8.26k | £9.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 JUN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Polmena House
LOSTWITHIEL
Cornwall
PL22 0LB
- Phone:
- 01208872310
- Email:
- info@lostwithielu3a.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window