THE DORNEYWOOD TRUST

Charity number: 1181660
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PRIME PURPOSE OF THE TRUST IS THAT OF MAINTAINING THE MANSION HOUSE AND GARDENS OF DORNEYWOOD AND THE BUILDINGS ON THE ESTATE IN A MANNER SUITABLE TO BE A RESIDENCE OF A SENIOR MINISTER OF THE CROWN

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lord Edward Lister Chair 09 March 2020
None on record
Viscount Thomas Chandos Trustee 21 March 2025
None on record
Juliet Souter Trustee 22 November 2024
None on record
Jeremy McIlroy Trustee 08 April 2022
None on record
Dr Ingrid Samuel Trustee 07 August 2019
THE HERITAGE ALLIANCE
Received: On time
NICOLA JANE ANDREWS Trustee 07 August 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £388.34k £315.47k £389.63k £423.28k £531.92k
Total expenditure £414.22k £444.23k £519.74k £541.10k £529.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £24.72k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £19.95k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £432.56k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £54.70k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £468.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £60.94k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Own use assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.69m
Long-term investments N/A N/A N/A N/A £33.00k
Other assets N/A N/A N/A N/A £348.66k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Total liabilities N/A N/A N/A N/A £64.97k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 08 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 31 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 18 April 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 14 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 01 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SETTLEMENT DATED 23 JUNE 1944, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 15 JUNE 1973, ORDERS 25 APRIL 1994 AND 30 AUGUST 2005 AND RESOLUTION 19 MAY 2006. as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE DORNEYWOOD ESTATE, THE MANSION HOUSE DORNEYWOOD, AND OTHER BUILDINGS THEREON AND OF CERTAIN FURNITURE AND CHATTELS BELONGING THERETO AND CERTAIN OBJECTS CONNECTED THEREWITH OR ANCILLARY THERETO.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Registration history
  • 25 February 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
DORNEYWOOD
DORNEY WOOD ROAD
BURNHAM
SLOUGH
SL1 8PY
Phone:
01628602454
Email:
No information available
Website:

WWW.DORNEYWOOD.ORG