THE CHRIS HARMANDA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
none this year
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
Governance
- 23 September 2020: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EKATERINI DAVID-HARMANDA MBE MBA BSC | Chair | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DAVIS | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELENI HARMANDA BA | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARIOS POULLOURA | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
LOUKIA HARMANDA-POULLOURA B.A. | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
NIKI DAVID-AUGUSTOU | Trustee | 01 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £31.45k | £15.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £5.23k | £16.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 16 December 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 16 December 2024 | 564 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 16 December 2024 | 564 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01 AUG 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02 SEP 2020 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15 SEP 2020
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONGST MEMBERS OF GREEK AND GREEK CYPRIOT COMMUNITY, WHO HAVE BEEN RESIDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE LAST CONSECUTIVE 5 YEARS, BY: (1) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF MONEY, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO POOR UNITED KINGDOM CITIZENS OF GREEK AND GREEK CYPRIOT ORIGIN, WHO RESIDE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND WHO, BY REASON (DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY) OF ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY ARE SUFFERING FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; (2) THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF MONEY, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO THE WIVES, HUSBANDS AND CHILDREN (OR THE CHILD’S LEGAL GUARDIAN) OF SUCH BENEFICIARIES AS ARE DESCRIBED IN SUB-CLAUSE 4(1) ABOVE; OR TO THE WIDOWS AND WIDOWERS OF SUCH BENEFICIARIES; OR IN THE EVENT OF SUCH A BENEFICIARY’S DEATH, TO ANY PERSON IN FINANCIAL HARDSHIP WHO HAD BEEN CO-HABITING WITH SUCH BENEFICIARY AT THE DATE OF HIS OR HER DEATH; AND (3) INSOFAR AS THE TRUSTEES ARE SATISFIED THAT THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS IN SUB-CLAUSES 4(1) AND 4(2) ABOVE ARE SUBSTANTIALLY FULFILLED OR OTHERWISE PROVIDED FOR (BUT NOT OTHERWISE), FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home & Away Estates
13 Station Parade
Cockfosters Road
BARNET
Hertfordshire
EN4 0DL
- Phone:
- 02083455678
- Website:
-
thechrisharmandafoundation.com (under construction)
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window