BRITISH COMMUNITY COUNCIL OF ISTANBUL

Charity Number: 1182199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Supports British citizens in distress in Turkey, makes grants for British students at the British Institute of Archaeology in Ankara, aids relief projects under British auspices in Istanbul and the British Protestant cemetery in Istanbul.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,928
Total expenditure: £15,603

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Turkey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 February 2019: CIO registration
  • 19 June 2019: Funds received from 1116540 BRITISH COMMUNITY COUNCIL
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Martin John Fryer Trustee 15 April 2025
None on record
Tobias John Windheuse Duthie Trustee 22 July 2024
None on record
Jonathan Anthony Rugman Trustee 29 April 2024
None on record
Patricia Anne Yale Trustee 23 October 2023
None on record
John Anthony Dovey Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Dr Michael Hadley Talbot Trustee 27 February 2020
UK ADVISING AND TUTORING
Received: On time
Rev Jonathan Collis Trustee 25 February 2019
THE ANGLICAN AND EASTERN CHURCHES ASSOCIATION (CIO)
Received: On time
THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
THE SPALDING MEMORIAL EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Patrick Mark Silvester Litton Trustee 25 February 2019
THE ANGLICAN-LUTHERAN SOCIETY
Received: On time
The Parochial Church Council of the Parish of St Etheldreda with St Clement, Fulham
Received: On time
Hugh Charles Howard Dunn Trustee 25 February 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £7.56k £13.70k £13.51k £13.87k £13.93k
Total expenditure £10.63k £8.33k £13.15k £16.83k £15.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 10 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 10 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 April 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 March 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 04 March 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
279 Campkin Road
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2LE
Phone:
01223351326
Website:

No information available