UK FRIENDS OF HKU

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a UK based charity which undertakes the following activity in collaboration with staff and alumni from HKU 1) Makes Grants To Organisations 2) Provides Advocacy/advice/information 3) Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Hong Kong
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 18 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEORGE PAYNE | Chair | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
BERNADETTE TSUI | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR RONALD LO | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|||||
IRENE YEE CHING MAN | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor ROSIE TSE TSE YOUNG | Trustee | 18 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.00k | £100 | £0 | £3.93k | £50 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.06k | £1.06k | £78 | £102 | £40 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 20 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 06 February 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 310 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 December 2022 | 310 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 12 December 2022 | 675 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 12 December 2022 | 675 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME) CONNECTED WITH THE UNIVERSITY OF HONG KONG AND ITS PAST AND PRESENT STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
174 LEIGH HUNT DRIVE
LONDON
N14 6DQ
- Phone:
- 07817853347
- Email:
- georgepayne.1305@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window