THE JOHN BETTS SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity owns the freehold of a building located at 7 Paddenswick Road London W6 0UA. It is provided to The John Betts School Foundation for the operation of a Primary School. Through its investments in property and listed investments The John Betts School Foundation provides funds for the repair and maintenance of the Fabric and the building.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 01 January 1961: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David William Goodhew | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sophy Doyle | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Hammersley | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Helen Diana Greenwood | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JONES | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Michael Askins | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.47k | £53.11k | £55.04k | £113.33k | £103.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £239.67k | £69.93k | £67.49k | £52.03k | £80.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 February 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
4. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: 4.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY MAINTAINING THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY (INCLUDING THE REPAIR AND INSURANCE OF ANY BUILDINGS THEREOF) AND ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT THEREOF AND ALL THE PROPER COSTS, CHARGES AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITY. 4.2 SUBJECT TO OBJECT 4.1 ABOVE, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY MAKING PAYMENTS TO THE GOVERNORS TO BE APPLIED BY THEM IN DISCHARGING THEIR OBLIGATIONS UNDER THE EDUCATION ACTS WITH RESPECT TO THE MAINTENANCE OF THE SCHOOL. 4.3 SUBJECT TO OBJECTS 4.1 AND 4.2 ABOVE: 4.3.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF ANY SPECIAL BENEFITS OF ANY KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL, AS MAY BE AGREED BETWEEN THE CHARITY AND THE GOVERNORS. 4.3.2 FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 YEARS WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING:- I IN AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES, MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OF EDUCATION, OR OTHER INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER (INCLUDING PROFESSIONAL OR TECHNICAL) EDUCATION APPROVED BY THE CHARITY; II IN PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS OR BOOKS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION (INCLUDING THE STUDY OF MUSIC AND OTHER ARTS), TO UNDERTAKE TRAVEL OR FURTHERANCE THEREOF, OR TO PREPARE FOR OR ENTER A PROFESSION, TRADE, OCCUPATION OR SERVICE ON LEAVING SCHOOL, UNIVERSITY OR OTHER EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT. 4.3.3 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECT 4.3.2 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY APPLY THE SAME IN THE MANNER SPECIFIED IN THAT OBJECT FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS WHO ARE OTHERWISE QUALIFIED WHO ALTHOUGH NOT PUPILS OR FORMER PUPILS AT THE SCHOOL ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF THE FORMER METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH. 4.4 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.1 TO 4.3 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY INVEST OR REINVEST THE SAME IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE POWERS OF INVESTMENT UNDER ARTICLE 5.14, IN ORDER TO PUT THE SAME TOWARDS THE FULFILMENT OF THE OBJECTS IN FUTURE YEARS. 4.5 IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME AND PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY CANNOT BE APPLIED IN ANY YEAR IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.1 TO 4.4 ABOVE THE CHARITY MAY PAY THE SAME TO THE TRUSTEES OF THE HAMMERSMITH UNITED CHARITIES FOR APPLICATION BY THEM FOR THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE ALMS-HOUSES AND THE BENEFIT OF THE BENEFICIARIES OF THAT CHARITY. 4.6 THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE DESIRABILITY OF CONSULTING THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY AS TO THEIR GENERAL ACTION UNDER OBJECTS 4.2 AND 4.3 ABOVE AND, IF OCCASION REQUIRES, AS TO THE EDUCATIONAL QUALIFICATIONS OF CANDIDATES FOR BENEFIT. 4.7 IN ALLOCATING BENEFITS IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF OBJECTS 4.2 AND 4.3 ABOVE THE CHARITY SHALL HAVE REGARD TO THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION OF A BROADLY CHRISTIAN NATURE.
Linked charities
- 01 January 1961 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Benbow Road
London
W6 0AU
- Phone:
- 07768664810
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window