ST. GEORGE INDIAN ORTHODOX CHURCH LEICESTER

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO ADVANCE THE DOCTRINES AND FAITH OF INDIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIANITY AMONG THE EXISTING MEMBERS, UPCOMING YOUNGER GENERATION AND NEW MEMBERS MIGRATING OR ADOPTING THIS FAITH IN THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS SUCH AS DERBY, NOTTINGHAM, KETTERING AND LINCOLN, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 09 January 2019: Standard registration
- ST. GEORGE INDIAN ORTHODOX CHRUCH LEICESTER (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Josen John | Chair | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robin Sabu | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Esob Melemalayil Philip | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Wilson Benny | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Syama Sam | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Aji John | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Bose George | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mebin Varghese Alex | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Libin Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nibu Pulimoottil Babu | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jiby Koshy | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jain Meperathu Varghese | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Binu Oonnunni John | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.78k | £12.45k | £11.11k | £38.93k | £59.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.69k | £8.91k | £12.49k | £24.05k | £40.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 June 2022 | 142 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE DOCTRINES AND FAITH OF INDIAN ORTHODOX CHRISTIANITY AMONG THE EXISTING MEMBERS, UPCOMING YOUNGER GENERATION AND NEW MEMBERS MIGRATING OR ADOPTING THIS FAITH IN THE LEICESTERSHIRE AND SURROUNDING AREAS SUCH AS DERBY, NOTTINGHAM, KETTERING AND LINCOLN, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Irvine Crescent
Lubbesthorpe
LEICESTER
LE19 4BT
- Phone:
- 07508188289
- Email:
- leicesterioc@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window