Trustees ASSOCIATION OF POLISH ENGINEERS IN GREAT BRITAIN
Charity number: 1181306

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARIAN ZASTAWNY | Chair | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Michal Kowalski | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michal Slawek | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Monika Kolatka | Trustee | 20 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tomasz Koperniak | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sebastian Czajka | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elwira Kaminska | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kamila Wiatr | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marek Jasinski | Trustee | 03 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alina Antonik | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Miroslawa Michniewicz | Trustee | 27 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Teresa Bilinska | Trustee | 31 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PIOTR SWIEBODA | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
RYSZARD CHMIELOWIEC | Trustee | 20 December 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.