ENCIRCLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are the prevention or relief of poverty by providing services and advice to those who are homeless or facing homelessness and those who are disadvantaged who may not have access to other support, by offering where appropriate and necessary, in particular but not exclusively, meals, essential items, guidance and physical, emotional and financial support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 April 2019: CIO registration
- AUSTIN COHEN GLOBAL FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Jayne Ross | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Barker-Wyatt | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Hubbard | Trustee | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael George Riding | Trustee | 06 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MOLLY FISHER | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.69k | £26.93k | £14.54k | £19.69k | £15.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.25k | £29.36k | £7.51k | £9.81k | £16.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £120 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 15 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING SERVICES AND ADVICE TO THOSE WHO ARE HOMELESS OR FACING HOMELESSNESS AND THOSE WHO ARE DISADVANTAGED WHO MAY NOT HAVE ACCESS TO OTHER SUPPORT, BY OFFERING WHERE APPROPRIATE AND NECESSARY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MEALS, ESSENTIAL ITEMS, GUIDANCE AND PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL AND FINANCIAL SUPPORT. 2. THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE OR ILL HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ADDICTION OR BEREAVEMENT BY PROVIDING SERVICES, WHICH WILL INCLUDE BUT WILL NOT BE LIMITED TO, THE PROVISION OF RELIEF, SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO PEOPLE WHO ARE LONELY AND/OR ISOLATED THROUGH LOCAL COMMUNITY PROJECTS RUN AND SUPPORTED BY VOLUNTEERS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FAWCETTS
WINDOVER HOUSE
ST. ANN STREET
SALISBURY
SP1 2DR
- Phone:
- 01722413413
- Email:
- hello@encircles.org
- Website:
-
encircles.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window