BOURNE CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bourne Heritage Centre open to public 2-4pm Sat/Sun plus holidays - all volunteers. Bourne Civic Society - cooperate and assist local and district councils in matters of common concern.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 22 March 1982: Standard registration
- 31 October 2018: Funds received from 1141043 BOURNE PRESERVATION TRUST
- BOURNE HERITAGE CENTRE (Working name)
- RAYMOND MAYS EXHIBITION (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRENDA LILIAN JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Elizabeth Patrick | Trustee | 07 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN PAUL SMITH | Trustee | 20 March 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.71k | £12.80k | £24.48k | £9.06k | £6.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.91k | £3.47k | £10.97k | £5.63k | £5.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £19.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 2 FEBRUARY 1978 AS AMENDED 11 OCTOBER 1981, 12 JANUARY 1984 AND 19 MARCH 2007
Charitable objects
THE SOCIETY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE CIVIL PARISH OF BOURNE WHICH AREA SHALL HEREINAFTER BE REFERRED TO AS 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT': (A) TO PROVIDE INFORMATION TO THE PUBLIC ON THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE AND STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT. (C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
THE CIVIL PARISH OF BOURNE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bourne Civic Society
21 South Street
Bourne
PE10 9LY
- Phone:
- 01778 422775
- Email:
- JPSMITHPIX@YAHOO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window