THE CRANTOCK SURF LIFESAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing surf lifesaving training to all ages of the local community in and around Crantock
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
Governance
- 04 July 2018: CIO registration
- 19 July 2018: Funds received from 1044062 THE CRANTOCK SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB
- CRANTOCK SLSC (Working name)
- THE CRANTOCK SURF LIFE SAVING CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMMIE SEWARD-ADAMS | Chair | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mark Colvin | Trustee | 21 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Martyn White | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Sousek | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Sensier | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Belinda Perkins | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
PATRICK HARTY | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.37k | £13.40k | £20.47k | £19.45k | £27.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.95k | £11.16k | £17.52k | £21.37k | £26.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.05k | N/A | £1.02k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 10 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jul 2018 as amended on 09 Feb 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CIO IS ESTABLISHED IS TO SAVE LIVES AND PREVENT DROWNING AND TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO LIFESAVING, RESCUE AND RESUSCITATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN CORNWALL AND IN PARTICULAR ON CRANTOCK BEACH, NEWQUAY BY; A) THE PROMOTION AND PROVISION OF SURF LIFESAVING QUALIFICATIONS AND TRAINING IN WATER SAFETY, RESCUE, LIFESAVING, COACHING, RESUSCITATION AND FIRST AID; B) THE PROMOTION AND ORGANISATION OF LIFESAVING AND RESCUE, BEACH AND POOL TRAINING, WATER SPORTS AND LIFESAVING ACTIVITIES FOR TRAINING, RECREATION AND ENJOYMENT THAT ENCOURAGE FITNESS, TEAM WORK, RESPONSIBILITY AND EXCELLENCE IN PURSUIT OF THESE OBJECTS; C) THE PROMOTION OF AND THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTARY LIFESAVING AND RESCUE SERVICES TO THE COMMUNITY AND PUBLIC AT LARGE; D) THE PROVISION OF LIFESAVING SAFETY AWARENESS AND PREVENTION OF DROWNING INFORMATION; AND E) THE PROMOTION OF THE CIO AND ITS ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Carneton Close
Crantock
NEWQUAY
TR8 5RY
- Phone:
- 07767885824
- Email:
- info@crantockslsc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window