INTERNATIONAL PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
IPWSO works to improve the quality of life for all people with Prader-Willi syndrome and their families worldwide. We provide information and support to caregivers, professionals and families. We encourage national PWS associations to exchange and share their projects and experiences. We fund free testing for diagnosis in countries where it is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- Cuba
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- El Salvador
- Estonia
- Finland
- Georgia
- Germany
- Greece
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Japan
- Mexico
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Norway
- Peru
- Poland
- Romania
- Slovakia
- South Africa
- South Korea
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- United States
Governance
- 09 April 2019: CIO registration
- IPWSO (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor ANTHONY JOHN HOLLAND | Chair | 24 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Lantz Yap Chee Seng | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott Arant | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tunde Baloghne Liplin | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Karin Clarke | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Svetlana Labun | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nathalie Kayadjanian | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Gabriela Erazo Alban | Trustee | 10 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Andrew Moore | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francois Besnier | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Marie Garrick | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kate Anne Woodcock | Trustee | 17 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.35k | £106.10k | £246.59k | £330.67k | £163.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.99k | £69.83k | £161.92k | £268.34k | £159.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Apr 2019 as amended on 29 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: 1) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF AND TREATMENT OF PEOPLE WITH PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME, AND TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND ADVICE FOR SUCH PERSONS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH BY PROMOTING, SUPPORTING AND CARRYING OUT CHARITABLE RESEARCH, AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT INTO THE CAUSE AND TREATMENT OF PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME; AND 3) TO RAISE AWARENESS ABOUT THE NEEDS OF PEOPLE WITH PRADER-WILLI SYNDROME THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
IPWSO
Salisbury House
2-3 Salisbury Villas
CAMBRIDGE
CB1 2LA
- Phone:
- 07511585700
- Email:
- office@ipwso.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window