WEST LONDON TURKISH VOLUNTEERS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We do festival once a year including Turkish cultural traditions in social context, including Turkish food, folk dances,Turkish music, we have weekend(Saturday) school for kids to help them Turkish speaking writing reading We have programs for Turkish food cooking for people who is interested We held religious days for Ramadan, eid or holy days
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 15 February 2024
Total income:
£503,109
Donations and legacies | £502.11k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £1.00k |
Total expenditure:
£118,836
Raising funds | £20.45k | |
Charitable activities | £98.39k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £98.39k | |
Retained for future use | £384.27k |
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 January 2019: Standard registration
- WEST LONDON TURKISH VOLUNTEERS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BAHRI GURKAN | Chair | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Halit Karakaya | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Suleyman Oktay | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ozkan Kalkan | Trustee | 03 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
EYUP OZDEMIR | Trustee | 15 February 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 15/02/2020 | 15/02/2021 | 15/02/2022 | 15/02/2023 | 15/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.87k | £86.32k | £139.50k | £284.68k | £503.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.05k | £47.53k | £97.86k | £115.61k | £118.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £502.11k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £98.39k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 15/02/2020 | 15/02/2021 | 15/02/2022 | 15/02/2023 | 15/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £160 | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £686.09k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 15 February 2024 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
15 February 2024
(These accounts |
06 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 February 2023 | 09 January 2024 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2023 | 09 January 2024 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 February 2022 | 19 December 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2022 | 19 December 2022 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2021 | 29 December 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 15 February 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 268 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 15 February 2020 | 09 September 2021 | 268 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 FEB 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JAN 2019 as amended on 22 Jan 2019 as amended on 21 Feb 2024 as amended on 01 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
1. 4(1) (1) The advancement of education for all through facilitation of educational support, in particular but not exclusively, through study groups, knowledge clubs and sessions at our education and cultural centre. By providing study groups that offers support to enhance understanding and practice of Turkish language, history, arts, culture and heritage, in particular by organising special days of celebration and the promotion of annual festivals to that end.' (2) The advancement of wider education opportunities through training and coaching in fields advocated by the membership
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rear of Mangal kebab
670 Hanworth Road
Whitton
HOUNSLOW
Middlesex
TW4 5NP
- Phone:
- 07889891568
- Email:
- contact.wltv@gmail.com
- Website:
-
Wltv.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window