TRIANGULAR CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Triangular was initially set up in 2014 as a community group. As the number of beneficiaries grew and the work expanded, the trustees decided to incorporate the organisation in 2018 for more accountability and transparency. The object of the CIO is to advance the education and training of those granted refugee status, seeking asylum, recent migrants and their dependents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Middlesbrough
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
Governance
- 22 June 2018: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Notash Moghaddam | Chair | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jama Jama | Trustee | 05 June 2023 |
|
|||||
Nabiha Diko | Trustee | 15 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mesai Mulugeta | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
NEJAT HABTOM | Trustee | 12 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
EYOB HAILE | Trustee | 05 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.94k | £80.23k | £90.06k | £102.99k | £252.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.83k | £50.78k | £77.17k | £95.68k | £250.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jun 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: 1) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS, SEEKING ASYLUM, RECENT MIGRANTS AND THEIR DEPENDENTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND TO ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT TO A NEW COMMUNITY; AND, 2) ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ABOUT THE ISSUES RELATING TO REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS AND IMMIGRANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Hub
273 High Street
GATESHEAD
NE8 1EP
- Phone:
- 01914771763
- Email:
- info@triangular.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window