Financial history HOLBROOK ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity number: 1181456
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £37.01k £52.36k £50.63k £113.48k £271.87k
Total expenditure £31.37k £35.96k £29.92k £47.20k £199.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A