MUKUL MADHAV FOUNDATION UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support causes in India and the UK with grants and donations that relieve and improve education and healthcare for poorer and disadvantaged families, social welfare, empowerment and the environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
Governance
- 01 April 2019: CIO registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RITU PRAKASH CHHABRIA | Chair | 01 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gayatri Prakash Chabria | Trustee | 06 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
VIJAY GOEL | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
|||||
Baroness Sandip Verma | Trustee | 11 February 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/08/2020 | 01/08/2021 | 01/08/2022 | 01/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £470.26k | £6.44k | £211.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £316.38k | £58.65k | £181.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2023 | 13 June 2024 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2021 | 23 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 August 2020 | 02 June 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 01 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED IN INDIA AND THE UK, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE BY THE MAKING OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
MUKUL MADHAV FOUNDATION UK
12 Charles Ii Street
1st Floor
London
SW1Y 4QU
- Phone:
- 02078394661
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window